skip to content

Handysides, Allan Robert

CPSO#: 19896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 201 2115 Finch Avenue West North York, ON M3N 2V6
Date Received: 18 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2014