skip to content

Handscomb, Sheina Elspeth Wilson

CPSO#: 25181

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Sep 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Harrow Health Clinic Incorporated 1480 County Road 13 Harrow ON N0R 1G0 Phone: 519-738-2000
Date Received: 14 Oct 2014


Address: Tippett Richardson Records Management 201 Sheppard Street East Windsor, ON N8X 2K6 Tel: (519) 254-5111
Date Received: 12 Dec 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2014