skip to content

Farhang Khoee, Hana

CPSO#: 96119

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Avenue, Suite 126
Windsor ON  N8X-3V6
Phone: 226-674-4120
Fax: 226-674-4121 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Advance Medical Group
230 Victoria Street, Suite 204
London ON  N6A 2C2
Canada
Phone: 519-873-1447
Fax: 519-873-1448
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hana Farhang Khoee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Farhang Khoee ( CPSO# 96119 )

Business Address:
Advanced Surgical Operatory Ltd.
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2

Business Address:
2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 126
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 674-4120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANA FARHANG KHOEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHANG KHOEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016