skip to content

Han, Lisa

CPSO#: 126505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: Michigan State University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. L. HAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Han ( CPSO# 126505)

Business Address:
189 Clark Ave
Thornhill ON  L3T 1T3

Business Address:
56 McNicoll Ave
North York ON  M2H 2A8
Phone Number: 4164934939

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:15 Jun 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist
General Pathology Effective:06 Sep 2022 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2022 Active
 Dr. LISA HAN may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology and general pathology.