skip to content

Hamza, Milan

CPSO#: 24448

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 25-Jan-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Palacky, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000