skip to content

Hammond, James Alexander

CPSO#: 27956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
68 Kinnear Cr
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 473-1542 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James A. Hammond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hammond ( CPSO# 27956 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Clinic
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ALEXANDER HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1983