skip to content

Hammad, Nazik Hammad Mohammed

CPSO#: 90355

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4502
Fax: (613) 546-8209 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nazik Hammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hammad ( CPSO# 90355 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:14 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active
             Dr. Nazik Hammad Mohammed Hammad may practise medicine independently in medical
            oncology, only.