skip to content

Hamilton-Irving, Jonathan Charles

CPSO#: 87484

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Liston Hamilton-Irving Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Aug 2007 to 21 Aug 2007
EL - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2013