skip to content

Hamilton, Thomas Rochester

CPSO#: 14526

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997