skip to content

Hamilton, Leslie Erin

CPSO#: 90452

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Pathology Lab
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2241
Fax: 613-738-4837 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLIE ERIN HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 08 Jun 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
EL - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
EL - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018