skip to content

Hamilton, Joanne Marie

CPSO#: 87584

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2007 to 19 Sep 2007
EL - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 18 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2017