skip to content

Hamilton, James Joel Alexander

CPSO#: 88806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford County CHC
Suite 301
35 Metcalf Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Phone: (519) 539-1111
Fax: (519) 539-9111 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES JOEL ALEXANDER HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010