skip to content

Hamilton, Gavin Michael

CPSO#: 103794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:29 Jul 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAVIN MICHAEL HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019