Hamilton, David Ian Stanley (CPSO#: 100679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID IAN STANLEY HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018