skip to content

Hamilton, Danielle Frances

CPSO#: 91077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1637 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: 613-369-5060
Fax: 613-421-4251 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Danielle Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hamilton ( CPSO# 91077 )

Business Address:
1637 Woodroffe Avenue, Suite 301
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 369-5060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELLE FRANCES HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011