skip to content

Hamidi, Ahmad Ali

CPSO#: 94773

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015