skip to content

Hamideh, Fayad

CPSO#: 92023

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Damascus, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1011 Upper Middle Road East
MCI Medical Clinic, Suite # E9
Oakville ON  L6H 4L1
Phone: (905) 849-7007
Fax: (905) 849-7883 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

5010 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5M 6J3
Canada
Phone: 905-288-5888
Fax: 905-820-3323
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fayad Hamideh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hamideh ( CPSO# 92023 )

Business Address:
MCI Doctor's Office
Suite E9
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 849-7007

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:24 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2011 Active
 Dr.  Fayad  Hamideh  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine and 
                  rheumatology, only.