skip to content

Hamid, Muhammad Akhter

CPSO#: 94134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2016
EXPIRY DATE
19 Jan 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7234 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:20 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2016 Active
 1.    Dr. Muhammad Akhter Hamid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Hamid holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Hamid no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Hamid's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Hamid's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  January 20, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 19, 2023.