skip to content

Hamer, Debra

CPSO#: 93896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street, Unit D2
Kingston ON  K7K 6L8
Phone: 613-531-5888 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DEBRA HAMER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hamer ( CPSO# 93896 )

Business Address:
Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street, Unit D2
Kingston ON  K7K 6L8

Business Address:
10 Traymoor Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4K8
Phone Number: 4165708286

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:07 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBRA HAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016