skip to content

Hameed, Usmaan

CPSO#: 88950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Ave E Suite 300
Toronto, ON
M2J 1V1
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: 647 258 9960 Ext. 4
Fax: 647 258 9965 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Odette Cancer
2075 Bayview Ave
M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-4027
Fax: 416-480-6002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Usmaan Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Hameed ( CPSO# 88950 )

Business Address:
300 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (647) 258-9960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. USMAAN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013