Hamedanchi, Reza (CPSO#: 99492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctors Office
PO Box 52
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: (416) 598-1703
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamedanchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hamedanchi ( CPSO# 99492 )

Business Address:
345 Bloor Street East
Suite 4A
Toronto ON  M1W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse Level
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Business Address:
100 King Street West
Lower Concourse
Toronto ON  M5X 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 867-1200

Business Address:
MCI The Doctors Office
PO Box 52
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA HAMEDANCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEDANCHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015