skip to content

Hambly, Nathan Daniel Morley

CPSO#: 90964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36704
Fax: 905-529-6515 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nathan Hambly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hambly ( CPSO# 90964 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Respirology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite T2117
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN DANIEL MORLEY HAMBLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013