skip to content

Halpert, Alison Grace

CPSO#: 90682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone: (705)478-0968
Fax: (705) 478-7347 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Halpert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Halpert ( CPSO# 90682 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone Number: (705) 478-0968

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON GRACE HALPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011