skip to content

Halpern, Janice Rise

CPSO#: 31509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
63 Elm Ridge Drive
Toronto, ON M6B1A2
Toronto ON  M6B 1A2
Phone: (416) 962-0228
Fax: (416) 787-6741 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Halpern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halpern ( CPSO# 30080 )
Dr. J. Halpern ( CPSO# 31509 )

Business Address:
Suite M5 318
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864


Corporation Name: Dr. Janice Halpern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halpern ( CPSO# 30080 )
Dr. J. Halpern ( CPSO# 31509 )

Business Address:
63 Elm Ridge Drive
Toronto ON  M6B 1A2
Phone Number: (416) 962-0228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANICE RISE HALPERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPERN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1980