skip to content

Halperin, Mitchell Lewis

CPSO#: 21583

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 60 Mosedale Crescent North York ON M2J 3A4
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.