skip to content

Halonen, Mark Allen

CPSO#: 95049

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Mar 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2021