skip to content

Hall-Findlay, Elizabeth Joy

CPSO#: 30269

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Dec 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Hall, Elizabeth Joy (used until: 17 Nov 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2003