skip to content

Hall, Ryan William

CPSO#: 93765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: (613) 900-0150 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance ( CPSO# 93461 )
Dr. R. Hall ( CPSO# 93765 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
6-35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013