skip to content

Hall, Melanie Erin

CPSO#: 89129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W1C2
Phone: 519-938-8000 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hall ( CPSO# 89129 )

Business Address:
375 Howden Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 5G4
Phone Number: (905) 790-2666

Business Address:
50 Rowling Hills Drive
Suite 5
Orangeville ON  L9W 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 942-0400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ERIN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011