skip to content

Hall, Hamilton

CPSO#: 19132

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Mar 2022
EXPIRY DATE
16 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Hall, John Hamilton (used until: 06 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: To request medical record, please send an email to: [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 2022