skip to content

Hall, Edward Jason

CPSO#: 91826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kansas City Univ of Medicine & Bioscienc, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Lyndoch Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone: (519) 813-9596 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E.J. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hall ( CPSO# 91826 )

Business Address:
348 Lyndoch Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 862-9596


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2011 Active
                   Dr.  Edward  Jason  Hall  may  practice  medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.