skip to content

Hall, Christopher Wayne

CPSO#: 27246

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 26 2012
Corporation Name: Chris W. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2015