skip to content

Hall, Alison Jacintha

CPSO#: 94217

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
815 College Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 923-5500
Fax: (416) 923-2249 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hall ( CPSO# 94217 )

Business Address:
815 College Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Phone Number: (416) 923-5500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON JACINTHA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2010 to 10 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2011 to 18 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2012