skip to content

Halder, Smita Luna Sudeshna

CPSO#: 89699

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
H S C 3V34
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76764
Fax: (905) 526-0594 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Smita Halder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halder ( CPSO# 89699 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room HSC 3V 34
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:05 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 23 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Smita Luna Sudeshna Halder may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of  Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
                        Halder holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Halder no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.