skip to content

Halbrich, Michelle Aimee

CPSO#: 99946

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 26 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 19 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015