skip to content

Halbert, Cyril Franklyn

CPSO#: 92120

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Georgetown University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2013