skip to content

Halankar, Jaydeep Arun

CPSO#: 85791

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Nov 2019
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mumbai, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
1 - P M B 286
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 566-1358 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Halankar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Halankar ( CPSO# 85791 )

Business Address:
585 University Ave
1 PMB-298
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: 416-566-1358


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:18 Nov 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Jaydeep Arun Halankar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which  Dr. Halankar holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Halankar no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr. Halankar's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when   the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about   Dr.   Halankar's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  November  18, 2019, and expires on August
                  31,  2022.  Upon renewal of Dr. Halankar's academic  appointment  at  the
                  University  of  Toronto,  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.