skip to content

Hakim, Mukhtar M M

CPSO#: 85800

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0052 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Suite 825
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-0997
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

45 Hannover Dr.
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Canada
Phone: 9056849999
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

202 - 710 Dorval Dr.
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: 9056070013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3155 Harvester Road, Suite 207
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-2080
Fax: (905) 635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Suite 303
2227 south Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.M. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hakim ( CPSO# 85800 )

Business Address:
Ancaster Endoscopy
Suite 205
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 5A1
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:05 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUKHTAR M M HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 26 Feb 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 27 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2008 to 23 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2011 to 23 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 29 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012