skip to content

Hakes, John Anthony Allan

CPSO#: 23056

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.A. Hakes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the clinic at which the patient was treated at to access medical records.
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015