skip to content

Haka-Ikse, Katerina

CPSO#: 22074

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Apr 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 1 888 316 4125
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2014

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Katerina Haka-Ikse to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

(i) Dr. Haka-Ikse will be retiring from the practice of medicine no later than April 15, 2014; and

(ii) Until her retirement, Dr. Haka-Ikse will not be taking on any new patients.