skip to content

Haji, Faizal Aminmohamed

CPSO#: 88553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurosurgery
Victory 3,Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3696
Fax: (613) 548-1346 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAIZAL AMINMOHAMED HAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2019