skip to content

Hainer, Tammy Lynne

CPSO#: 86444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Wilson, Tammy Lynne (used until: 27 Jan 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg, ON
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg, ON
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tammy Hainer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hainer ( CPSO# 86444 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Suite 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAMMY LYNNE HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2010