skip to content

Hailu, Maru Endalew

CPSO#: 85365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Ethiopian

Education:Jimma University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 433-0001 Ext. `
Fax: (905) 721-1366 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARU ENDALEW HAILU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAILU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008