skip to content

Haight, James Stratford Jackson

CPSO#: 27978

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:Oxford University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Haight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: The medical files for each paitent are within their respective clinics: The Polyclinic 2 Champagne Dr Toronto ON M3J 2C5 The Albany Clinic 807 Broadview Ave Toronto ON M4K 2P8 101 - 491 Eglington W Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Dec 2018