skip to content

Haiduk, Michael John

CPSO#: 31093

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1984