skip to content

Haider, Erum

CPSO#: 87463

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Health Centre
Unit # 18 - 1615 Dundas Street
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 240-2880
Fax: (905) 240-3880 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNIT 9 ,1288 RITSON ROAD NORTH
Oshawa ON  L1G 7Z9
Canada
Phone: 905 240 7662
Fax: 289 731 2064
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.Erum Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 87463 )

Business Address:
9 - 1288 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7Z9
Phone Number: (905) 240-7662

Business Address:
Medical Health Centre
Unit #18 - 1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-2880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERUM HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 23 Oct 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009