skip to content

Haider, Atika

CPSO#: 95297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit. 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905)6230323
Fax: (905) 6970230 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atika Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider ( CPSO# 95297 )

Business Address:
Unit 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-0323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATIKA HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015