skip to content

Haidar, Nadim Hicham

CPSO#: 94738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-5300
Fax: (705) 450-5900 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nadim Haidar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Haidar ( CPSO# 94738 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Suite 335
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 254-4364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:25 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADIM HICHAM HAIDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 13 Feb 2011
EL - Urology

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2011 to 14 Apr 2011
EL - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)