skip to content

Haggith, Yevgeniya

CPSO#: 95517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Spanish

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Davis Dr.
Suite 308
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (844) 942-4448
Fax: (844) 424-4484 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Haggith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Haggith ( CPSO# 95517 )

Business Address:
308 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (844) 942-4448

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YEVGENIYA HAGGITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016