skip to content

Hafez, Mohammed Nassoh

CPSO#: 86961

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capital Cardiology
602-2 Gurdwara rd
Ottawa ON  K2E 1A2
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Nassoh Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hafez ( CPSO# 86961 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Business Address:
602 - 2 Gurdwara Road
Ottawa ON  K2E 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 714-9855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED NASSOH HAFEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2009 to 01 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2010 to 01 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2011 to 01 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007